MO HB1064 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions relating to civil actions arising from COVID-19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to civil actions arising from COVID-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-25HouseBill Reconsidered (H)
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-09HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2021-03-02HouseReferred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H)
2021-02-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback