MO HB1060 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elections
Title
Changes the laws regarding elections
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-23 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 23, 3:15PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-12 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 035 | |
2012-04-03 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Laid Over (H) - HA 1/HCS PENDING | |
2012-04-03 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-09 | Prefiled (H) |