MO HB1056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of an "organization" for certain statutes governing urban rehabilitation projects
Title
Expands the definition of an "organization" for certain statutes governing urban rehabilitation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |