MO HB1056 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-18 - Referred: Ways and Means (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-18 - Referred: Ways and Means (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes McDonald County to impose, upon voter approval, a surcharge on the rental of rooms and certain recreational equipment to offset the costs of providing emergency services in the county
Title
Authorizes McDonald County to impose, upon voter approval, a surcharge on the rental of rooms and certain recreational equipment to offset the costs of providing emergency services in the county
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Lant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-09 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1056&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1056I.htm |