MO HB1052 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to land surveyors
Title
Modifies provisions relating to land surveyors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - HB 1052 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - with HCA 1 AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |