MO HB1052 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Social Services to develop incentive programs to encourage health care facilities to co-locate on the property of certain public elementary and secondary schools
Title
Requires the Department of Social Services to develop incentive programs to encourage health care facilities to co-locate on the property of certain public elementary and secondary schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1052&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1052I.htm |