MO HB1031 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Referred: Ways and Means (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Referred: Ways and Means (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax amnesty program
Title
Establishes a tax amnesty program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1031&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1031I.htm |