MO HB1030 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 15, 2:00PM, SCR 2
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 15, 2:00PM, SCR 2
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the collection of money owed to the state and establishes a state amnesty program
Title
Changes the laws regarding the collection of money owed to the state and establishes a state amnesty program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 15, 2:00PM, SCR 2 | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2012-03-01 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-01 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 000 | |
2012-03-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 000 | |
2012-02-29 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 4 | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)(H) | |
2012-02-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred: Budget(H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled (H) |