MO HB1024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to academic performance standards.
Title
Creates new provisions relating to academic performance standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |