MO HB1024 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a commission on capitol security infrastructure
Title
Establishes a commission on capitol security infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 1024 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |