MO HB1023 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to seclusion and restraint policies in public schools.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to seclusion and restraint policies in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |