MO HB1010 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to the disclosures of identifiable information regarding certain children
Title
Establishes provisions relating to the disclosures of identifiable information regarding certain children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House: HB 1010 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House: HB 1010 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 12, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Welfare(S) |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |