MO HB1006 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Joint Committee on Renewable Technology and Industrial Onsite Energy Generation
Title
Establishes the Joint Committee on Renewable Technology and Industrial Onsite Energy Generation
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Cancelled (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Renewable Energy | |
2011-04-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1006&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB1006I.htm |