MO HB1002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the ownership of motor vehicles
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the ownership of motor vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - HB 1002 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 29, 2015, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2015-04-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1, HCA 2 and HCA 3 AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |