MO HB1 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATION BILL
Title
APPROPRIATION BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HB 1 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HB 1 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELED - Friday, April 21, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELED -Thursday, April 20, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2023, 9:30 a.m. or 15 minutes upon adjournment, whichever is later, Senate Committee Room 2. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 18, 2023, 2:00 p.m. or 15 minutes upon adjournment, whichever is later, Senate Committee Room 2. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-30 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Taken Up |
2023-03-28 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Taken Up |
2023-03-28 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - 6 hours total debate on Perfection. AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred: Subcommittee on Appropriations - General Administration(H) |
2023-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |