MO HB1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money to the Board of Fund Commissioners
Title
Appropriates money to the Board of Fund Commissioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - HB 1 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - HB 1 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - HB 1 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - HB 1 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - HB 1 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-05-08 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-23 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-23 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-23 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 2, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2, Marik-up |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 1, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2, Marik-up |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, March 31, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Monday, March 30, 2015, 12:30pm, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Thursday, March 19, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 19, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thirty minutes (30) upon morning recess. Senate Committee Room 2 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up |
2015-03-10 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up |
2015-03-10 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - Do Pass with a time limit of six hours total debate on perfection. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Budget(H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1, HCA 2, HCA 3, HCA 4, HCA 6 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred: Appropriations - General Administration(H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |