MN SF959 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author stricken Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author stricken Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal child and adult care food program administration modification
Title
Federal child and adult care food program administration modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Author stricken Abeler |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Policy |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF547 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance