MN HF547 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child and Adult Care Food Program administration by the Health Department provided.
Title
Child and Adult Care Food Program administration by the Health Department provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] | Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Roz Peterson [R] |
Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Reform |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Johnson, S. |
2017-02-15 | House | Authors added Lee, Clark, and Allen. |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Ward. |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF959 (Similar To) 2017-03-20 - Author stricken Abeler