MN SF761 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Motion did not prevail
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota premium security plan funding operation extension; reporting specifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota premium security plan funding operation extension; reporting specifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House: Davids motion - Suspension of Rules (Y: 46 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Davids motion - Suspension of Rules (Y: 46 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseMotion did not prevail
2019-03-20HouseMotion to suspend rules
2019-03-12HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseMotion did not prevail
2019-03-11HouseMotion to suspend rules
2019-03-11HouseSenate file first reading
2019-03-11HouseReceived from Senate
2019-03-11SenateThird reading Passed
2019-03-11SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-03-07SenateSecond reading
2019-03-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-03-04SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-02-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-02-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF629 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Author added West

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0761&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF761&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF761&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF761&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF761&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=797
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0761&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10085
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0761&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10085

Bill Comments

feedback