MN SF605 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus state government appropriations bill; omnibus veterans and military affairs appropriations bill
Title
Omnibus state government appropriations bill; omnibus veterans and military affairs appropriations bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 75 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 75 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 91 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 75 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: (Y: 57 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: (Y: 73 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 55 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 91 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Veto message laid on table | |
2017-05-12 | Governor veto | |
2017-05-12 | Secretary of State Chapter 44 | |
2017-05-12 | Governor's action Veto | |
2017-05-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 75-56 |
2017-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2017-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 75-56 |
2017-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-05-09 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-33 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House conferees Anderson, S.; O'Driscoll; Dettmer; Fenton; Nash |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Anderson, B.; Koran; Hall; Laine |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2017-04-18 | House | House conferees Anderson, S.; O'Driscoll; Dettmer; Fenton; and Nash. |
2017-04-18 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Anderson, B.; Koran; Hall; Laine |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-04-06 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 75-55 |
2017-04-06 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-04-06 | House | Point of order raised Multiple points of order. |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2017-04-06 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2017-04-06 | House | Amended |
2017-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-30 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF691 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means