MN SF562 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 19 04/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 19 04/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Autism early intensive intervention benefit provisions modifications
Title
Autism early intensive intervention benefit provisions modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Secretary of State Chapter 19 04/27/17 | |
2017-05-01 | Governor's action Approval 04/27/17 | |
2017-04-27 | Governor approval | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Returned from House |
2017-04-25 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading |
2017-04-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 24, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-03-20 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF919 |
2017-03-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF919 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Authors added Clark and Loeffler.