MN SF544 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF559
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ophthalmic prescriptions provider-patient relationship requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ophthalmic prescriptions provider-patient relationship requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRule 45; subst. General Orders HF559
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading
2019-02-18SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-01-28SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF559 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 31 05/17/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback