MN SF4062 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Lippert; Heintzeman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Lippert; Heintzeman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus environment policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus environment policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 70 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Stephenson - Amendment - S4062A4 (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - S4062A14 (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Sundin - Amendment - A22-0450 (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Stephenson - Amendment - S4062A4 (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Swedzinski - Amendment - S4062A14 (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Sundin - Amendment - A22-0450 (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Lippert; Heintzeman |
2022-05-03 | House | House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Lippert; Heintzeman |
2022-05-03 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Tomassoni; Eichorn; Weber; Eken |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Tomassoni; Eichorn; Weber; Eken |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2022-04-28 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-04-28 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-04-28 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2022-04-28 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2022-04-28 | House | Amended |
2022-04-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 28, 2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-04-24 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2022-04-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4492 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means