MN SF3798 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Rest
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Rest
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Micheal Gau Memorial Bridge designation
Title
Micheal Gau Memorial Bridge designation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3437, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-02-29 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Author added Dibble |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3437 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 84