MN SF3750 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drought relief provisions and grants; appropriation
Title
Drought relief provisions and grants; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Authors added Eichorn; Ruud |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3598 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Hollins