MN SF3665 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Data classification in the statewide voter registration system
Title
Data classification in the statewide voter registration system
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |