MN SF3660 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Kunesh
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Kunesh
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Metro Mobility funding forecast clarification provision
Title
Metro Mobility funding forecast clarification provision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3613, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3613 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 86