MN SF3636 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3768
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3768
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Process for approval of structured settlement amendment; Structured settlement purchase companies requirement to register and provide a surety bond; appropriating money
Title
Process for approval of structured settlement amendment; Structured settlement purchase companies requirement to register and provide a surety bond; appropriating money
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3768 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Chief author added Utke |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Mathews |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3768 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 62