MN HF3768 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer of structured settlement payment rights process and approval amended, structured settlement purchase companies required to register and provide a surety bond, disclosures to payees required, certain practices prohibited, enforcement of prohibited practices and judicial sanctions authorized, judicial consideration of best interest factors required, attorney evaluator appointment authorized, and money appropriated.
Title
Transfer of structured settlement payment rights process and approval amended, structured settlement purchase companies required to register and provide a surety bond, disclosures to payees required, certain practices prohibited, enforcement of prohibited practices and judicial sanctions authorized, judicial consideration of best interest factors required, attorney evaluator appointment authorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3768 (Y: 126 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 121 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 121 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 62 | |
2022-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2022-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-05-11 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3636 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3636, now on General Orders |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-05-06 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-06 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-06 | House | Amended |
2022-05-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 6, 2022 |
2022-04-29 | House | Author added Schultz |
2022-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2022-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Moller |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2022-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF3636 (Similar To) 2022-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3768