MN SF3571 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Voter registration photo ID requirement; voter identification card creation; provisional ballot establishment; reporting and appropriation
Title
Voter registration photo ID requirement; voter identification card creation; provisional ballot establishment; reporting and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Newman [R] | Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |