MN SF3510 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3872
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3872
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Higher education policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus Higher education policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3872 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Author added Rarick |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3872 (Similar To) 2022-05-22 - Motion did not prevail to take from table