MN SF3450 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Author added Rest
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Author added Rest
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nameless job application review process implementation income and corporate franchise tax credit imposition
Title
Nameless job application review process implementation income and corporate franchise tax credit imposition
Sponsors
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Author added Rest |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3947 (Similar To) 2016-04-20 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance