MN SF3441 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Excavation notice system contact information database requirement
Title
Excavation notice system contact information database requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2719 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance