MN SF34 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Earned sick and safe time provision and appropriation
Title
Earned sick and safe time provision and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Sen. Susan Pha [D] |
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Chief author added Pappas |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Maye Quade |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Labor |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF19 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance