MN SF3255 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation, motor vehicles and drivers provisions modification
Title
Transportation, motor vehicles and drivers provisions modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-05-14 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Reported to the House |
2020-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 14, 2020 |
2020-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3494 |
2020-05-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Chief author added Newman |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Jasinski |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3494 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - HF indefinitely postponed