MN SF3168 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State lands lease security requirement, surplus land sales through online auctions, state parks and forests additions and deletion; state lands interests sales and conveyances authorization
Title
State lands lease security requirement, surplus land sales through online auctions, state parks and forests additions and deletion; state lands interests sales and conveyances authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 186 | |
2018-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill was passed vote: 128-0 |
2018-05-17 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3424 |
2018-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3424 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed