MN HF3424 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lease provisions modified, public land sale requirements modified, state park and forest additions and deletions provided, mixed uses authorized, and state land sales and conveyances of interest provided.
Title
Lease provisions modified, public land sale requirements modified, state park and forest additions and deletions provided, mixed uses authorized, and state land sales and conveyances of interest provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-14 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3168 |
2018-05-10 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Johnson, C., as chief author. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3168 (Similar To) 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed