MN SF3086 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Dahms
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Dahms
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grain storage facility safety grant program establishment; University of Minnesota (U of M) extension grain storage facility safety curriculum creation; grain storage facility safety digital applications; appropriations
Title
Grain storage facility safety grant program establishment; University of Minnesota (U of M) extension grain storage facility safety curriculum creation; grain storage facility safety digital applications; appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Author added Dahms |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3927 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division