MN SF2936 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County agricultural society tax modifications
Title
County agricultural society tax modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3104 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes