MN SF2848 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Promotion of importance and recruitment of peace officers appropriation; police reimbursement grants pathway provision
Title
Promotion of importance and recruitment of peace officers appropriation; police reimbursement grants pathway provision
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3333 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Author added Anderson