MN SF2827 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Withdrawn and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-09 - Withdrawn and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Machine guns regulation modifications
Title
Machine guns regulation modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn and returned to author |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2609 (Similar To) 2024-05-17 - Bill was repassed as amended by Conference