MN HF2609 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Author stricken Myers
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Author stricken Myers
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Gun trafficking investigations and firearm seizures report required by Bureau of Criminal Apprehension and Violent Crime Enforcement Teams, trigger activator definition amended, and transferring firearms to persons who are ineligible to possess firearms penalties increased.
Title
Gun trafficking investigations and firearm seizures report required by Bureau of Criminal Apprehension and Violent Crime Enforcement Teams, trigger activator definition amended, and transferring firearms to persons who are ineligible to possess firearms penalties increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
Rep. Larry Kraft [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Lucille Rehm [D] | Rep. Mary Clardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Author stricken Myers |
2024-04-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-04-08 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Clardy |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Rehm |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Berg as chief author |
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Myers |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2827 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance