MN SF278 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota Pharmacy Benefit Manager Licensure and Regulation Act; appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota Pharmacy Benefit Manager Licensure and Regulation Act; appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 130 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18 Secretary of State Chapter 39
2019-05-18 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-17 Governor approval
2019-05-17 Presented to Governor
2019-05-17SenateHouse adopted SCC report and repassed bill
2019-05-16HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference
2019-05-16HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2019-05-16HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2019-05-16HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2019-05-16HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2019-05-16SenateThird reading
2019-05-16SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2019-05-16SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2019-05-13SenateHouse conferees Mann; Morrison; Munson
2019-05-10HouseHouse conferees Mann, Morrison, Munson
2019-05-10HouseHouse accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
2019-05-10HouseSenate conferees Jensen, Benson, and Klein
2019-05-10HouseSenate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-05-09SenateSenate conferees Jensen; Benson; Klein
2019-05-09SenateSenate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-05-09SenateReturned from House with amendment
2019-05-09HouseBill was passed
2019-05-09HouseThird reading
2019-05-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 09, 2019
2019-05-02HouseSecond reading
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
2019-04-10HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-04-04HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-04-04HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate
2019-04-04SenateThird reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-04-03SenateSecond reading
2019-04-03SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2019-03-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-01-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF728 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF0278&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF278&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF278&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF278&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF278&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF278&version=4&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF278&version=5&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=2165
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0278&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10422
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0278&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10460
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF0278&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10461

Bill Comments

feedback