MN HF728 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy benefit managers licensure and regulations created, and rulemaking authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit managers licensure and regulations created, and rulemaking authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-13HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-13HouseAuthors added Brand and Poston
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Moller
2019-02-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Schultz
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Neu
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Munson, Gruenhagen, Huot, Persell, Baker, and Lueck
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF278 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 39 05/17/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback