MN SF2581 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Northfield Mill Towns state trail local trail connections development bond issue and appropriation
Title
Northfield Mill Towns state trail local trail connections development bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Author added Little |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2511 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division