MN SF2581 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage loan originators licensing requirements modifications
Title
Mortgage loan originators licensing requirements modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3158 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3158 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 104 04/25/18