MN HF3158 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 104 04/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 104 04/25/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage loan originator licensing requirements modified.
Title
Mortgage loan originator licensing requirements modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 104 04/25/18 | |
2018-04-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-04-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-04-25 | Governor approval | |
2018-04-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2581 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2581, now on General Orders |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill was passed vote: 126-0 |
2018-03-19 | House | Third reading |
2018-03-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2581 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3158