MN SF258 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform probate code harmless error provision sunset removal
Title
Uniform probate code harmless error provision sunset removal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-08 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-02-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF279 |
2021-02-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF279 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - HF indefinitely postponed