MN SF2574 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Anderson
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Anderson
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Military Museum at Camp Ripley bond issue and appropriation
Title
Minnesota Military Museum at Camp Ripley bond issue and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Anderson |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Authors added Duckworth; Howe; Newton |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2672 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Authors added Poston, Erickson, Ecklund, Dettmer, Lueck