MN SF2545 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2945
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2945
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Intensive residential treatment service provider entities and crisis stabilization services requirements modification
Title
Intensive residential treatment service provider entities and crisis stabilization services requirements modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2945 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2945 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 151